Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1063 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021