House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Energy
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Gann
|
|
|