Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1072 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021