House
|
04/19/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|