Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2021