Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021