House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|