Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill June 7, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021