House | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Dollens |