Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021