House
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|