Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021