House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Nollan
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Moore, Waldron, Mize, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Conley
|
|
|