Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2021