House
|
05/24/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, McCortney, Pugh, Garvin, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Pae
|
|
|