Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1784 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021