House
|
05/11/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
SA's considered
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Remove as principal author Representative Miller and substitute with Representative Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|