Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 12, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2021