House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Martinez, Miller, Boatman, Caldwell (Trey), Steagall, Wolfley, Lawson, Echols, Manger, Conley
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Mize, Townley, Stark, Dills, Hill, Hasenbeck, Nollan, Moore, Newton
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Roe
|
|
|