Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1904 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2021