Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Montgomery | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) |