Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative McCall |