Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2022