Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Lowe (Dick), Osburn, Marti, McDugle, Sneed, Dempsey, Sims, Bashore, Williams, Russ, Hill, Dills
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell
|
|
|