ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2083 By: McCall, O'Donnell, Wallace, Davis, Lowe (Dick), Osbu rn, Marti, McDugle, Sneed, Dempsey, Sims, Bashore, Williams, Russ, Hill and Dills of the House and Daniels of the Senate An Act relating to revenue and taxati on; providing for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant to Oklahoma Income Tax Code; specifying amount of deduction; specifying taxable years for which deduction is authorized; stating legislative intent with respect to corporate income tax reven ue; providing for noncodification; providing for codification; and providing an effective date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified in the Oklahoma Statute s as Section 2358.101 of Title 68, unless there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, there shall be allowed as a deduction from the Oklahoma taxable income amount computed pursuan t to Section 2358 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or from the amount of income subject to the levy of tax imposed pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes for any corporation subject to the levy of income tax ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 imposed pursuant to s ubsection E or F of Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes in the following amounts: 1. Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, and before January 1, 2023; 2. Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, and before January 1, 2024; 3. Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023, and before January 1, 2025; 4. Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and before January 1, 2026; and 5. One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2026. SECTION 2. NEW LAW A new section of law not to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: It is the intent of the Legislature to make modifications to offset potential revenue losses, should they occur, reasonably attributable to the reduction of Oklahoma taxable income amounts for corporations provided by Section 1 of this act and to provide a system to ensure that revenues apportioned to the Education Reform ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Revolving Fund, the Teachers' Retirement System, and the Ad Valorem Reimbursement Fund are not adversely affected. SECTION 3. This act shall become effective January 1, 2022. Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of March, 2021. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2021. Presiding Officer of the Senate