Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | ||
2 | 2 | ||
3 | - | ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 Page 1 1 | |
3 | + | HB2083 HFLR Page 1 | |
4 | + | BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 | |
4 | 5 | 2 | |
5 | 6 | 3 | |
6 | 7 | 4 | |
7 | 8 | 5 | |
8 | 9 | 6 | |
9 | 10 | 7 | |
10 | 11 | 8 | |
11 | 12 | 9 | |
12 | 13 | 10 | |
13 | 14 | 11 | |
14 | 15 | 12 | |
15 | 16 | 13 | |
16 | 17 | 14 | |
17 | 18 | 15 | |
18 | 19 | 16 | |
19 | 20 | 17 | |
20 | 21 | 18 | |
21 | 22 | 19 | |
22 | 23 | 20 | |
23 | 24 | 21 | |
24 | 25 | 22 | |
25 | 26 | 23 | |
26 | 27 | 24 | |
27 | 28 | ||
28 | - | ENGROSSED HOUSE | |
29 | - | BILL NO. 2083 By: McCall, O'Donnell, Wallace, | |
30 | - | Davis, Lowe (Dick), Osbu rn, | |
31 | - | Marti, McDugle, Sneed, | |
32 | - | Dempsey, Sims, Bashore, | |
33 | - | Williams, Russ, Hill and | |
34 | - | Dills of the House | |
29 | + | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION | |
35 | 30 | ||
36 | - | ||
31 | + | STATE OF OKLAHOMA | |
37 | 32 | ||
38 | - | Daniels of the Senate | |
33 | + | 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) | |
34 | + | ||
35 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE | |
36 | + | FOR | |
37 | + | HOUSE BILL NO. 2083 By: McCall, O'Donnell and | |
38 | + | Wallace | |
39 | 39 | ||
40 | 40 | ||
41 | 41 | ||
42 | 42 | ||
43 | + | ||
44 | + | ||
45 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE | |
43 | 46 | ||
44 | 47 | An Act relating to revenue and taxation; pro viding | |
45 | 48 | for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant | |
46 | 49 | to Oklahoma Income Tax Code; specifying amount of | |
47 | 50 | deduction; specifying taxable years for which | |
48 | 51 | deduction is authorized; stating legislative intent | |
49 | 52 | with respect to corporate income tax revenue; | |
50 | 53 | providing for noncodification; providing for | |
51 | 54 | codification; and providing an effective date. | |
52 | 55 | ||
53 | 56 | ||
54 | 57 | ||
55 | 58 | ||
59 | + | ||
60 | + | ||
56 | 61 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: | |
57 | 62 | SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified | |
58 | 63 | in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358.101 of Title 68, unless | |
59 | 64 | there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: | |
60 | 65 | For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, there | |
61 | 66 | shall be allowed as a deduction from the Oklahoma taxable income | |
62 | 67 | amount computed pursuant to Section 2358 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma | |
63 | 68 | Statutes or from the amount of income subject to the levy of tax | |
64 | - | imposed pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma | |
65 | - | Statutes for any corporation subject to the levy of income tax | |
66 | 69 | ||
67 | - | ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 Page 2 1 | |
70 | + | HB2083 HFLR Page 2 | |
71 | + | BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 | |
68 | 72 | 2 | |
69 | 73 | 3 | |
70 | 74 | 4 | |
71 | 75 | 5 | |
72 | 76 | 6 | |
73 | 77 | 7 | |
74 | 78 | 8 | |
75 | 79 | 9 | |
76 | 80 | 10 | |
77 | 81 | 11 | |
78 | 82 | 12 | |
79 | 83 | 13 | |
80 | 84 | 14 | |
81 | 85 | 15 | |
82 | 86 | 16 | |
83 | 87 | 17 | |
84 | 88 | 18 | |
85 | 89 | 19 | |
86 | 90 | 20 | |
87 | 91 | 21 | |
88 | 92 | 22 | |
89 | 93 | 23 | |
90 | 94 | 24 | |
91 | 95 | ||
96 | + | imposed pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma | |
97 | + | Statutes for any corporation subject to the levy of income tax | |
92 | 98 | imposed pursuant to subsec tion E or F of Section 2355 of Title 68 of | |
93 | 99 | the Oklahoma Statutes in the following amounts: | |
94 | 100 | 1. Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income | |
95 | 101 | amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, and | |
96 | 102 | before January 1, 2023; | |
97 | 103 | 2. Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income | |
98 | 104 | amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, and | |
99 | 105 | before January 1, 2024; | |
100 | 106 | 3. Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income | |
101 | 107 | amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023 , and | |
102 | 108 | before January 1, 2025; | |
103 | 109 | 4. Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income | |
104 | 110 | amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and | |
105 | 111 | before January 1, 2026; and | |
106 | 112 | 5. One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable | |
107 | 113 | income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, | |
108 | 114 | 2026. | |
109 | 115 | SECTION 2. NEW LAW A new section of law not to be | |
110 | 116 | codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: | |
111 | 117 | It is the intent of the Legislature to make modifications to | |
112 | 118 | offset potential revenue losses, should they occur, reasonably | |
113 | 119 | attributable to the reduction of Oklahoma taxable income amounts for | |
114 | - | corporations provided by Section 1 of this act and to provide a | |
115 | - | system to ensure that revenues apportioned to the Education Reform | |
116 | 120 | ||
117 | - | ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 Page 3 1 | |
121 | + | HB2083 HFLR Page 3 | |
122 | + | BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 | |
118 | 123 | 2 | |
119 | 124 | 3 | |
120 | 125 | 4 | |
121 | 126 | 5 | |
122 | 127 | 6 | |
123 | 128 | 7 | |
124 | 129 | 8 | |
125 | 130 | 9 | |
126 | 131 | 10 | |
127 | 132 | 11 | |
128 | 133 | 12 | |
129 | 134 | 13 | |
130 | 135 | 14 | |
131 | 136 | 15 | |
132 | 137 | 16 | |
133 | 138 | 17 | |
134 | 139 | 18 | |
135 | 140 | 19 | |
136 | 141 | 20 | |
137 | 142 | 21 | |
138 | 143 | 22 | |
139 | 144 | 23 | |
140 | 145 | 24 | |
141 | 146 | ||
147 | + | corporations provided by Section 1 of this act and to provide a | |
148 | + | system to ensure that revenues apportioned to the Education Refor m | |
142 | 149 | Revolving Fund, the Teachers' Retirement System, and the Ad Valorem | |
143 | 150 | Reimbursement Fund are not adversely affected. | |
144 | 151 | SECTION 3. This act shall become effective January 1, 2022. | |
145 | - | Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of March, 2021. | |
146 | 152 | ||
147 | - | ||
148 | - | ||
149 | - | ||
150 | - | Presiding Officer of the House | |
151 | - | of Representatives | |
152 | - | ||
153 | - | ||
154 | - | Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2021. | |
155 | - | ||
156 | - | ||
157 | - | ||
158 | - | ||
159 | - | Presiding Officer of the Senate | |
153 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 03/01/2021 - DO PASS, | |
154 | + | As Amended and Coauthored. |