House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Quinn, Taylor, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|