Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021