House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Garvin, Paxton, Leewright, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Withdrawn from Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|