Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022