House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Murdock, Hall, Howard, Kidd, Boren, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Leewright
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|