House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Cornwell
|
|
|