Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 23, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021