Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson, Rogers, Burns, Kidd, Standridge, Quinn, Garvin, Simpson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Mize
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Ford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Conley, West (Kevin), Kendrix, Hardin (David), Grego, McDugle, Dills, Stearman, Miller, Russ
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|