Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2021