House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Manger
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, considered and deferred
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Backed up to General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading and advancement rescinded
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|