Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2021