House
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|