Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2471 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2021