House
|
04/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Marti
|
|
|