Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2676 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021