House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Mize
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Randleman
|
|
|