Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2768 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022