House
|
05/27/2022
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/27/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
2 CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
2 CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
2 CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Treat, McCortney, Hall, Floyd, Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Special Conference Committee on ARPA
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|