Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022
Bill March 1, 2021