House
|
05/27/2022
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/27/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
2 CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
2 CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
2 CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
SCs changed Leewright, Allen, Rader, Jech, Boren, Hicks to Thompson, McCortney, Treat, Hall, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Further conference granted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR rejected, further conference requested, naming Special Conference Committee on ARPA
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Remove Senator Leewright as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Allen, Rader, Jech, Boren, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Energy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|