Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022
Bill May 18, 2021

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021