House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|