Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2874 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021