Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2972 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2022

Amended

Bill March 30, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022